IA HF515 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the criminal elements for the commission of sexual misconduct with offenders, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 72; See HF 2505.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the criminal elements for the commission of sexual misconduct with offenders, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 72; See HF 2505.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 312. |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2020 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Jeneary and Olson. H.J. 109. |
2019-04-27 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 351. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB72 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 354.
SSB1057 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF273 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1076.
HF2505 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Fiscal note.
SSB1057 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF273 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1076.
HF2505 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF515 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF515.html |