IA HF504 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the health education requirement for grades nine through twelve under the education standards.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the health education requirement for grades nine through twelve under the education standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Kurth and Shipley. H.J. 372. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 349. |
Same As/Similar To
SF270 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 376. S.J. 409.
SF376 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Behn, and J. Smith. S.J. 68.
SF376 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Behn, and J. Smith. S.J. 68.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF504 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF504.html |