IA SF376 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Behn, and J. Smith. S.J. 68.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Behn, and J. Smith. S.J. 68.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the health education requirement for grades nine through twelve under the education standards. (Formerly SF 270.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the health education requirement for grades nine through twelve under the education standards. (Formerly SF 270.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Behn, and J. Smith. S.J. 68. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Education. S.J. 858. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3098 filed. S.J. 819. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 813. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3109 filed. S.J. 813. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3091 out of order. S.J. 813. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendments S-3091 and S-3092 filed. S.J. 797. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 784. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3089 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 784. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 663. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3043 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 663. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3011 adopted. S.J. 663. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Amendment S-3011 filed. S.J. 421. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 409. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 401. |
Same As/Similar To
SF270 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 376. S.J. 409.
HF504 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
HF504 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF376 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF376.html |