IA HF499 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to suspension of a student's participation in the all Iowa opportunity scholarship program.(Formerly HSB 138.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to suspension of a student's participation in the all Iowa opportunity scholarship program.(Formerly HSB 138.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-17 | House | SF 285 substituted. H.J. 461. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 378. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1068 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 285.
HSB138 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 372.
SF285 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
HSB138 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 372.
SF285 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF499 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF499.html |