IA HF484 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 755.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle accidents resulting in injury or death, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 123.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle accidents resulting in injury or death, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 123.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Transportation. H.J. 755.
2019-03-26HouseAmendment H-1075 filed. H.J. 653.
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 338.

Same As/Similar To

HSB123 (Related) 2019-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback