IA HSB123 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF484

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle accidents resulting in injury or death, and making penalties applicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle accidents resulting in injury or death, and making penalties applicable.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2019 12:30PM House Lounge.
2019-02-05HouseSubcommittee: Thorup, Hinson and Kressig. H.J. 212.
2019-02-05HouseBy COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

HF484 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 755.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback