IA HF474 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Referred to Education. H.J. 869.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Referred to Education. H.J. 869.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the disposition or modification of uncollectible student debt owed to the college student aid commission. (Formerly HSB 95.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the disposition or modification of uncollectible student debt owed to the college student aid commission. (Formerly HSB 95.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Education. H.J. 869. |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 479. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1058 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 10:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
HSB95 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 453.
HSB95 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 453.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF474 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF474.html |