IA HF464 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 961.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 961.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the crossing of highways by all-terrain vehicles and off-road utility vehicles, and making a penalty applicable. (Formerly HF 302.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the crossing of highways by all-terrain vehicles and off-road utility vehicles, and making a penalty applicable. (Formerly HF 302.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 961. |
2017-04-04 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 878. |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 878. |
2017-03-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 808. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 811. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 810. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 736. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Bowman, and Brown. S.J. 605. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 585. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 585. |
2017-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2017-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 616. |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 477. |
Same As/Similar To
HF302 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.