IA HF451 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a psychiatric patient placement clearinghouse and inpatient psychiatric bed tracking system work group. (See HF 624.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a psychiatric patient placement clearinghouse and inpatient psychiatric bed tracking system work group. (See HF 624.)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Fry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2019 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-20 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Bacon and Derry. H.J. 332. |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 319. |
Same As/Similar To
HF624 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 755.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF451 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF451.html |