IA HF443 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 567.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 567.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of inventory checklists upon commencement and termination of residential tenancies and including applicability provisions.(See HF 676, HF 2471.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of inventory checklists upon commencement and termination of residential tenancies and including applicability provisions.(See HF 676, HF 2471.)
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Lohse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 567. |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Hansen and Mitchell. H.J. 207. |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 676. |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 498. |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 12:45PM RM 15. |
2021-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Hansen and Wheeler. H.J. 332. |
2021-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 325. |
Same As/Similar To
HF676 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 567.
HF2471 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Subcommittee: Lofgren, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 561.
HF2471 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Subcommittee: Lofgren, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 561.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF443 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF443.html |