IA HF435 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to emergency contact information for use by the department of transportation and law enforcement, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 136.) Effective date: 01/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to emergency contact information for use by the department of transportation and law enforcement, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 136.) Effective date: 01/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1200. |
2021-06-10 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 899. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 822. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 821. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Substituted for SF 439. S.J. 820. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Attached to companion SF 439. S.J. 476. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 546. |
2021-02-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays none. H.J. 428. |
2021-02-15 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 310. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB136 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 301.
SSB1181 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 439.
SF439 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 821.
SSB1181 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 439.
SF439 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 821.