IA HF393 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including the surrender or transfer of registration plates and cards to a county treasurer, documentary fees charged by motor vehicle dealers, and motor vehicle franchise obligations.(Formerly HSB 86; See HF 829.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including the surrender or transfer of registration plates and cards to a county treasurer, documentary fees charged by motor vehicle dealers, and motor vehicle franchise obligations.(Formerly HSB 86; See HF 829.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 866. |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 829. |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 680. |
2021-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 12:45PM House Lounge. |
2021-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Isenhart and Wheeler. H.J. 332. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 303. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB86 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 393.
SSB1206 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 444.
SF444 (Similar To) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 854.
HF829 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SSB1206 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 444.
SF444 (Similar To) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 854.
HF829 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF393 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF393.html |