IA HSB86 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including the surrender or transfer of registration plates and cards to a county treasurer, documentary fees charged by motor vehicle dealers, and motor vehicle franchise obligations.(See HF 393, HF 829.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including the surrender or transfer of registration plates and cards to a county treasurer, documentary fees charged by motor vehicle dealers, and motor vehicle franchise obligations.(See HF 393, HF 829.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 393. |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 291. |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2021 4:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Maxwell and Running-Marquardt. H.J. 126. |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 122. |
2021-01-20 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HF393 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SSB1206 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 444.
SF444 (Replaced by) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 854.
HF829 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SSB1206 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 444.
SF444 (Replaced by) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 854.
HF829 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB86 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB86.html |