IA HF352 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to an entity-level taxation election for pass-through entities and allowing a partner or shareholder to claim a credit against the individual and corporate income taxes and the franchise tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 69.) Effective date: 05/11/2023. Applicability date: 01/01/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to an entity-level taxation election for pass-through entities and allowing a partner or shareholder to claim a credit against the individual and corporate income taxes and the franchise tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 69.) Effective date: 05/11/2023. Applicability date: 01/01/2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-16HouseFiscal note.
2023-05-11HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 1039.
2023-05-09HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
2023-04-27HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 914.
2023-04-26SenateImmediate message. S.J. 982.
2023-04-26SenatePassed Senate, yeas 46, nays 3. S.J. 981.
2023-04-25SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 962.
2023-04-24SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-04-20SenateSubcommittee Meeting: [].
2023-04-20SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, Quirmbach, and Zaun. S.J. 917.
2023-04-18SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 844.
2023-04-17SenateRead first time, passed on file. S.J. 779.
2023-04-17SenateFiscal note.
2023-04-17SenateMessage from House. S.J. 779.
2023-04-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 860.
2023-04-13HousePassed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 854.
2023-04-13HouseAmendment H-1199 adopted. H.J. 853.
2023-04-11HouseAmendment H-1199 filed. H.J. 806.
2023-03-15HouseFiscal note.
2023-02-20HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 369.

Same As/Similar To

HSB69 (Related) 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 352.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF352
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF352.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGR/90/attachments/HF352.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/90/attachments/HF352.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1370168.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1371718.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1374179.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230413_HJNL.pdf#854
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230425_SJNL.pdf#962
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230426_SJNL.pdf#981
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230426_SJNL.pdf#980
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#962
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#980

Bill Comments

feedback