IA HF314 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of utility maintenance vehicle. (Formerly HSB 10.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of utility maintenance vehicle. (Formerly HSB 10.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 954. |
2017-04-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 960. |
2017-04-11 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 938. |
2017-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1308. H.J. 937. |
2017-04-05 | House | Senate amendment H-1308 filed. H.J. 898. |
2017-04-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 896. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 898. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 896. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amendment S-3269 adopted. S.J. 896. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Amendment S-3269 filed. S.J. 840. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 735. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, Anderson, and Lykam. S.J. 413. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 391. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 391. |
2017-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 451. |
2017-03-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 504. |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0. H.J. 443. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 277. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB10 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 246.