IA HSB10 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF314
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of utility maintenance vehicle.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of utility maintenance vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 246. |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: R. Taylor, Hager and Ourth. H.J. 177. |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2017 11:00AM House Lounge |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2017 11:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2017 11:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled) |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: R. Taylor, Hager and R. Smith. H.J. 88. |
2017-01-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HF314 (Replaced by) 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB10 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB10.html |