IA HF302 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 11:45AM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 11:45AM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring rescission of existing regulations by state agencies when new regulations are adopted, providing for approval by the department of management of rulemaking, providing related procedures, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act requiring rescission of existing regulations by state agencies when new regulations are adopted, providing for approval by the department of management of rulemaking, providing related procedures, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 11:45AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Moore, T. and Nielsen. H.J. 253. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 225. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF302 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF302.html |