IA HF29 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to shared operational functions for purposes of supplementary weighting for school districts and including applicability provisions. (See HF 508 and HF 633.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to shared operational functions for purposes of supplementary weighting for school districts and including applicability provisions. (See HF 508 and HF 633.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1035. |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 453. |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, Breckenridge and Dolecheck. H.J. 116. |
2017-03-06 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 90. |
Same As/Similar To
HF508 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
HF633 (Similar To) 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 997.
HF633 (Similar To) 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 997.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF29 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF29.html |