IA HF283 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of tanning facilities and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of tanning facilities and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Brink, Best and Brown-Powers. H.J. 235. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 223. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF283 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF283.html |