IA HF282 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Subcommittee: Rozenboom, McClintock, and T. Taylor. S.J. 410.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Subcommittee: Rozenboom, McClintock, and T. Taylor. S.J. 410.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the management of soil and water resources, by providing for certain practices and projects, including projects described in the Iowa nutrient reduction strategy.(Formerly HF 69.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the management of soil and water resources, by providing for certain practices and projects, including projects described in the Iowa nutrient reduction strategy.(Formerly HF 69.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, McClintock, and T. Taylor. S.J. 410. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture. S.J. 416. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 379. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 379. |
2023-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 407. |
2023-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 596. |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 399. |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 301. |
Same As/Similar To
HF69 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 407.