IA HF273 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 745.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 745.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for an exemption from tort liability arising from winter recreational activities on commercial property.(See HF 745.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for an exemption from tort liability arising from winter recreational activities on commercial property.(See HF 745.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 745. |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 568. |
2021-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2021-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 8:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Meyer, B. and Salmon. H.J. 438. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 232. |
Same As/Similar To
HF745 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF273 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF273.html |