IA HF2674 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to tax credits awarded by the economic development authority for specific capital contributions made to certified rural business growth funds for investment in qualified businesses.(Formerly HSB 722.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to tax credits awarded by the economic development authority for specific capital contributions made to certified rural business growth funds for investment in qualified businesses.(Formerly HSB 722.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/09/2024 8:30AM Room 315. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Brown, and Dotzler. S.J. 741. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 723. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 723. |
2024-04-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 713. |
2024-04-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 737. |
2024-04-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 713. |
2024-04-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 707. |
2024-04-01 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 685. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB722 (Related) 2024-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2674.