IA HF267 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 89.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 89.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to clerks of court, including the number of counties in which a clerk may serve and residency requirements. (Formerly HSB 8.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to clerks of court, including the number of counties in which a clerk may serve and residency requirements. (Formerly HSB 8.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 89. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 464. S.J. 855. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 855. |
2019-04-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 736. |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays none. H.J. 718. |
2019-04-03 | House | Amendment H-1003 adopted. H.J. 718. |
2019-02-11 | House | Amendment H-1003 filed. H.J. 255. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 220. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB8 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 214.
SSB1063 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF464 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191.
SSB1063 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF464 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191.