IA SF464 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to clerks of court, including the number of counties in which a clerk may serve and residency requirements. (Formerly SSB 1063.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to clerks of court, including the number of counties in which a clerk may serve and residency requirements. (Formerly SSB 1063.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3152 filed. S.J. 928. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 267. S.J. 855. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 458. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 450. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB8 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 214.
SSB1063 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF267 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 89.
SSB1063 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF267 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 89.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF464 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF464.html |