IA HF2667 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the treasurer of state's duties, including Iowa educational savings plan trust and Iowa ABLE savings plan trust requirements and disposition of unclaimed property, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2537, HSB 626.) Effective date: 07/01/2024 Applicability date: 01/01/2024
Title
A bill for an act relating to the treasurer of state's duties, including Iowa educational savings plan trust and Iowa ABLE savings plan trust requirements and disposition of unclaimed property, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2537, HSB 626.) Effective date: 07/01/2024 Applicability date: 01/01/2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26. |
2024-04-26 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 924. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays 0. H.J. 915. |
2024-04-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8388. H.J. 915. |
2024-04-19 | House | Senate amendment H-8388 filed. H.J. 915. |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 892. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 933. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 931. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5155 adopted, as amended. S.J. 931. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5208 to S-5155 filed, adopted. S.J. 931. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amendment S-5155 filed. S.J. 822. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 822. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2024 8:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dickey, Jochum, and Rowley. S.J. 699. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 638. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 638. |
2024-03-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 680. |
2024-03-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 690. |
2024-03-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 668. |
2024-03-21 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-20 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 628. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3116 (Related) 2024-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2236.
HSB626 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2537.
SF2236 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
HF2537 (Similar To) 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 681.
HSB626 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2537.
SF2236 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
HF2537 (Similar To) 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 681.