IA HF2638 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 727.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 727.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act excluding nonqualified deferred compensation income from the individual income tax, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 2105.)
Title
A bill for an act excluding nonqualified deferred compensation income from the individual income tax, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 2105.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 727. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 638. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 638. |
2024-03-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 680. |
2024-03-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 690. |
2024-03-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 671. |
2024-03-04 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 447. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2105 (Similar To) 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 681.