IA HF2629 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2670.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2670.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the direct shipment of alcoholic liquor and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 83; See HF 2670.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the direct shipment of alcoholic liquor and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 83; See HF 2670.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2670. |
2024-03-19 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 626. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2024-03-06 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Forbes and Jones. H.J. 536. |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 384. |
Same As/Similar To
HF83 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2629.
HF2670 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 629.
HF2670 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 629.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2629 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2629.html |