IA HF2603 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to previous law enforcement certification by other states. (Formerly HSB 546.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to previous law enforcement certification by other states. (Formerly HSB 546.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 773. |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772. |
2024-03-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 656. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 626. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 626. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2276. S.J. 625. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2276. S.J. 429. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 429. |
2024-02-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 481. |
2024-03-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 508. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 497. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays 0. H.J. 477. |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 294. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB546 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2603.
SSB3008 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2276.
SF2276 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.
SSB3008 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2276.
SF2276 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.