IA HSB546 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2276
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2603
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2603
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2603.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2603.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to previous law enforcement certification by other states.(See HF 2603.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to previous law enforcement certification by other states.(See HF 2603.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2603. |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 284. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2024 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2024-01-11 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Vondran, Dieken and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 88. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Vondran, Dieken and Olson. H.J. 72. |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 69. |
2024-01-10 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3008 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2276.
SF2276 (Replaced by) 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.
HF2603 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SF2276 (Replaced by) 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.
HF2603 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB546 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB546.html |