IA HF2577 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including requiring the boards of directors of school districts and the governing boards of charter schools to publish certain specified information, modifying provisions related to required social studies instruction, and providing civil penalties. (Formerly HF 2499, HSB 706.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including requiring the boards of directors of school districts and the governing boards of charter schools to publish certain specified information, modifying provisions related to required social studies instruction, and providing civil penalties. (Formerly HF 2499, HSB 706.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Shall amendment H–8299, to amendment H–8273, be adopted? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Shall amendment H–8299, to amendment H–8273, be adopted? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 648. |
2022-03-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 730. |
2022-03-29 | House | Passed House, yeas 60, nays 36. H.J. 716. |
2022-03-29 | House | Amendment H-8273 adopted, as amended. H.J. 716. |
2022-03-29 | House | Amendment H-8286 to amendment H-8273 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 716. |
2022-03-29 | House | Amendment H-8299 to amendment H-8273, yeas 96, nays 0, filed, adopted. H.J. 715. |
2022-03-28 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-28 | House | Amendment H-8273 filed. H.J. 706. |
2022-03-24 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 690. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB706 (Related) 2022-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2499.
HF2499 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 730.
HF2499 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 730.