IA HF2576 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Amendment H-8139 filed. H.J. 569.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Amendment H-8139 filed. H.J. 569.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the adjustments to state foundation aid paid to a school district following an assessed value reduction for certain property and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2176.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the adjustments to state foundation aid paid to a school district following an assessed value reduction for certain property and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2176.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8139 filed. H.J. 569. |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 397. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2176 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 351.
SF2123 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2123 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2576 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2576.html |