IA HF2572 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for programs and regulations administered and enforced by the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 2439, HSB 673; See HF 2581.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for programs and regulations administered and enforced by the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 2439, HSB 673; See HF 2581.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 811. |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2581. |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 751. |
2022-03-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2022 7:45AM House Lounge. |
2022-03-29 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Gjerde and Maxwell. H.J. 730. |
2022-03-25 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 657. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3095 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2230.
HSB673 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2439.
SF2230 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2439 (Similar To) 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
HF2581 (Similar To) 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.
HSB673 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2439.
SF2230 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2439 (Similar To) 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
HF2581 (Similar To) 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.