IA HF2561 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 777.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 777.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assessment and taxation of wind energy conversion property and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 704.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assessment and taxation of wind energy conversion property and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 704.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 777. |
2022-04-04 | House | SF 2366 substituted. H.J. 766. |
2022-03-21 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-16 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 585. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3130 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2366.
HSB704 (Related) 2022-03-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2561.
SF2366 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Fiscal note.
HSB704 (Related) 2022-03-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2561.
SF2366 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Fiscal note.