IA HF2558 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 569.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 569.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to interpreters for limited-English-proficient, deaf, and hard-of-hearing persons in certain court proceedings and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 662; See HF 2619.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to interpreters for limited-English-proficient, deaf, and hard-of-hearing persons in certain court proceedings and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 662; See HF 2619.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 569. |
2020-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-26 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Hagenow and Wolfe. H.J. 395. |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 371. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB662 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 298.
SSB3148 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2320.
SF2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Fiscal note.
HF2619 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 571.
SSB3148 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2320.
SF2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Fiscal note.
HF2619 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 571.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2558 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2558.html |