IA HF2619 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 571.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 571.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to interpreters for limited-English-proficient, deaf, and hard-of-hearing persons in certain court proceedings and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2558, HSB 662.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to interpreters for limited-English-proficient, deaf, and hard-of-hearing persons in certain court proceedings and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2558, HSB 662.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 571. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB662 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 298.
SSB3148 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2320.
SF2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Fiscal note.
HF2558 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 569.
SSB3148 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2320.
SF2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Fiscal note.
HF2558 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 569.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2619 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2619.html |