IA HF2532 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to classroom management and related practitioner preparation procedures for reporting alleged classroom violence and assaults, to corporal punishment, establishing a grant program and fund for creation of therapeutic classrooms, providing claims reimbursement to schools for the transportation of certain students to therapeutic classrooms, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 598.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to classroom management and related practitioner preparation procedures for reporting alleged classroom violence and assaults, to corporal punishment, establishing a grant program and fund for creation of therapeutic classrooms, providing claims reimbursement to schools for the transportation of certain students to therapeutic classrooms, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 598.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 689. |
2020-03-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2020 9:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Dolecheck, Kerr and Mascher. H.J. 394. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Kerr and Winckler. H.J. 394. |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 338. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3080 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2190.
HSB598 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 309.
SF2190 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2360. S.J. 372.
SF2360 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
HSB598 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 309.
SF2190 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2360. S.J. 372.
SF2360 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2532 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2532.html |