IA SF2190 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2360. S.J. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2360. S.J. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to classroom management and related practitioner preparation procedures for reporting alleged classroom violence and assaults, to corporal punishment, establishing a grant program and fund for creation of therapeutic classrooms, providing claims reimbursement to schools for the transportation of certain students to therapeutic classrooms, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3080; See SF 2360.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to classroom management and related practitioner preparation procedures for reporting alleged classroom violence and assaults, to corporal punishment, establishing a grant program and fund for creation of therapeutic classrooms, providing claims reimbursement to schools for the transportation of certain students to therapeutic classrooms, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3080; See SF 2360.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2360. S.J. 372. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Celsi, and Lofgren. S.J. 289. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 279. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 241. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 235. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3080 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2190.
HSB598 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 309.
SF2360 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
HF2532 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
HSB598 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 309.
SF2360 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
HF2532 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2190 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2190.html |