IA HF2525 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the direct shipment of alcoholic liquor and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2108.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the direct shipment of alcoholic liquor and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2108.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2022 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Graber and Nielsen. H.J. 489. |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 354. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2108 (Similar To) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2525.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2525 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2525.html |