IA HF2517 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to trusts, including irrevocable trusts, trust petitions, and trust proceedings. (Formerly HF 2344.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to trusts, including irrevocable trusts, trust petitions, and trust proceedings. (Formerly HF 2344.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 927. |
2024-04-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925. |
2024-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 757. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 768. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 765. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 521. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/13/2024 8:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Reichman, and Weiner. S.J. 508. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 505. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 505. |
2024-03-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 554. |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays 0. H.J. 546. |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 266. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2344 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 554.