IA HF2512 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act enacting the social work licensure compact. (Formerly HF 2272.) Effective date: 07/01/2024
Title
A bill for an act enacting the social work licensure compact. (Formerly HF 2272.) Effective date: 07/01/2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/23. |
2024-04-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 719. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 737. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 734. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 524. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 11:00AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and Koelker. S.J. 402. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 375. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 375. |
2024-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 380. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. |
2024-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 373. |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 265. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2272 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 380.