IA HF25 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 241.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act authorizing the reduction of damages payable to an unresponsive property owner in condemnation proceedings and including applicability provisions.(See HF 150.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act authorizing the reduction of damages payable to an unresponsive property owner in condemnation proceedings and including applicability provisions.(See HF 150.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-02HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 241.
2023-01-30HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 150.
2023-01-26HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 201.
2023-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-01-18HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2023 12:00PM House Lounge 2.
2023-01-13HouseSubcommittee: Stone, Lohse and Wilburn. H.J. 117.
2023-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 76.

Same As/Similar To

HF150 (Similar To) 2023-02-07 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Bousselot, and Weiner. S.J. 276.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback