IA HF2488 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1121.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1121.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of young adults to appointive boards, commissions, committees, and councils. Effective 7-01-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of young adults to appointive boards, commissions, committees, and councils. Effective 7-01-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1121. | |
2010-03-16 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 987. | |
2010-03-16 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 987. | |
2010-03-09 | Message from Senate. H.J. 853. | |
2010-03-09 | Immediate message. S.J. 730. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed Senate, ayes 36, nays 14. S.J. 728. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 636. | |
2010-02-25 | Subcommittee, Sodders, Danielson, and Seymour. S.J. 605. | |
2010-02-25 | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 582. | |
2010-02-25 | Message from House. S.J. 582. | |
2010-02-24 | Immediate message. H.J. 709. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 2. H.J. 707. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 602. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=1432C&ga=83 |