IA HF2487 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including by modifying provisions related to mandatory reporting to the board of educational examiners of certain specified school employees, complaints against school employees and the investigation of complaints against school employees, and the responsibilities of the department of education and the board of educational examiners. (Formerly HSB 568.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including by modifying provisions related to mandatory reporting to the board of educational examiners of certain specified school employees, complaints against school employees and the investigation of complaints against school employees, and the responsibilities of the department of education and the board of educational examiners. (Formerly HSB 568.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 927. |
2024-04-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 756. |
2024-04-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 745. |
2024-04-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 772. |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed House, yeas 89, nays 0. H.J. 741. |
2024-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8267. H.J. 741. |
2024-04-02 | House | Senate amendment H-8267 filed. H.J. 715. |
2024-04-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 712. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 705. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 705. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5115 filed, adopted. S.J. 704. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 541. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Donahue, and Evans. S.J. 539. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 513. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 513. |
2024-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 565. |
2024-03-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 563. |
2024-03-11 | House | Amendment H-8178 adopted, as amended. H.J. 563. |
2024-03-11 | House | Amendment H-8188 to amendment H-8178 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 563. |
2024-03-11 | House | Amendment H-8185 to amendment H-8178 filed, adopted. H.J. 563. |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8178 filed. H.J. 555. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 253. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3042 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
HSB568 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2487.
HSB568 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2487.