IA SSB3042 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2487
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mandatory reporting to the board of educational examiners of licensed school employees who engage in grooming behavior toward students or the abuse of students.
Title
A bill for an act relating to mandatory reporting to the board of educational examiners of licensed school employees who engage in grooming behavior toward students or the abuse of students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 12:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Donahue, and Gruenhagen. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB568 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2487.
HF2487 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
HF2487 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3042 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3042.html |