IA HF2481 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Amendment H-8422 filed. H.J. 961.
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Amendment H-8422 filed. H.J. 961.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to various conservation and recreation activities under the purview of the department of natural resources, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 631)
Title
A bill for an act relating to various conservation and recreation activities under the purview of the department of natural resources, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 631)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Amendment H-8422 filed. H.J. 961. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 947. | |
2010-03-10 | Amendment H-8407 filed. H.J. 929. | |
2010-03-09 | Amendment H-8384 filed. H.J. 890. | |
2010-03-08 | Amendment H-8354 filed. H.J. 848. | |
2010-03-04 | Amendment H-8346 filed. H.J. 824. | |
2010-03-02 | Amendments H-8315 and H-8322 filed. H.J. 806. | |
2010-03-02 | Amendments H-8301, H-8307, and H-8313 filed. H.J. 805. | |
2010-03-02 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2010-03-01 | Amendment H-8300 filed. H.J. 777. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 601. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=1425C&ga=83 |