IA HF2478 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1153.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1153.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to business organizations, including limited liability companies and business corporations, and providing for fees. Effective 7-01-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to business organizations, including limited liability companies and business corporations, and providing for fees. Effective 7-01-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1153. | |
2010-03-19 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1120. | |
2010-03-19 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1120. | |
2010-03-11 | Message from House. S.J. 808. | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate message. H.J. 947. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 941. | |
2010-03-11 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8386. H.J. 941. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate amendment H-8386 filed. H.J. 890. | |
2010-03-09 | Message from Senate. H.J. 873. | |
2010-03-09 | Immediate message. S.J. 730. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 730. | |
2010-03-09 | Amendment S-5188 adopted. S.J. 730. | |
2010-03-04 | Amendment S-5188 filed. S.J. 695. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 683. | |
2010-02-25 | Subcommittee, Hogg, Schoenjahn, and Ward. S.J. 605. | |
2010-02-25 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 581. | |
2010-02-25 | Message from House. S.J. 581. | |
2010-02-24 | Immediate message. H.J. 709. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 706. | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 588. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=1422C&ga=83 |