IA HF2472 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the final disposition and disinterment of human remains. (Formerly HSB 521.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the final disposition and disinterment of human remains. (Formerly HSB 521.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 484. |
2020-03-04 | House | SF 2135 substituted. H.J. 462. |
2020-03-04 | House | Amendment H-8061 adopted. H.J. 462. |
2020-03-03 | House | Amendment H-8061 filed. H.J. 447. |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 316. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB521 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 299.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2472 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2472.html |