IA HF2466 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 963.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 963.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to veterans by making appropriations to the commission of veterans affairs for the provision of veterans services and by providing certain sales tax exemptions to qualified organizations representing veterans, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Effective 5-25-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to veterans by making appropriations to the commission of veterans affairs for the provision of veterans services and by providing certain sales tax exemptions to qualified organizations representing veterans, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Effective 5-25-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 963. | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 962. | |
2012-05-18 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 962. | |
2012-05-09 | Message from House. S.J. 947. | |
2012-05-09 | Immediate message. H.J. 960. | |
2012-05-09 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 947. | |
2012-05-09 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8519. H.J. 947. | |
2012-05-09 | Senate amendment H-8519. H.J. 947. | |
2012-05-09 | Message from Senate. H.J. 944. | |
2012-05-09 | Immediate message. S.J. 934. | |
2012-05-09 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 933. | |
2012-05-09 | Amendment S-5260 filed, adopted. S.J. 933. | |
2012-05-09 | Substituted for Senate File 2334. S.J. 933. | |
2012-04-11 | Read first time and attached to similar Senate File 2334. S.J. 775. | |
2012-04-11 | Message from House. S.J. 775. | |
2012-04-11 | Immediate message. H.J. 804. | |
2012-04-11 | Passed House, ayes 93, nays none. H.J. 800. | |
2012-04-06 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 763. |