IA HF2442 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing cities to impose a tax to fund a public library.
Title
A bill for an act allowing cities to impose a tax to fund a public library.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2024 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2024-02-21 | House | Subcommittee: Harris, Judge and Wills, J. H.J. 361. |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 240. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2442 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2442.html |