IA HF2423 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 730.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 730.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to operating-while-intoxicated offenses, including temporary restricted licenses and ignition interlock devices, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 618.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to operating-while-intoxicated offenses, including temporary restricted licenses and ignition interlock devices, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 618.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 730. |
2024-04-03 | House | SF 2261 substituted. H.J. 721. |
2024-04-03 | House | Amendments H-8014, H-8015 and H-8016 out of order. H.J. 721. |
2024-04-03 | House | Amendment H-8269 adopted. H.J. 721. |
2024-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8269 filed. H.J. 715. |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635. |
2024-02-19 | House | Amendment H-8016 filed. H.J. 318. |
2024-02-16 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendments H-8014 and H-8015 filed. H.J. 287. |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 229. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3015 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2261.
HSB618 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2423.
SF2261 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Fiscal note.
HSB618 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2423.
SF2261 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Fiscal note.